KANG LI TENG - GLOUCESTER ON - CANADA
KANG LI TENG - GLOUCESTER ON - CANADA
644553
Person Overview
KANG LI TENG is a company officer from Gloucester ON in Canada.
According to our records this person is, or was, a Director of COSMOPOLITAN INDUSTRIES GOLF CANADA LTD..
Address
199 Riversedge Cr
Gloucester ON
K1V 0Z7
Canada
Map
Company Appointments
Name | Active From | Address | town | country |
---|---|---|---|---|
COSMOPOLITAN INDUSTRIES GOLF CANADA LTD. | 1989-03-01 to 2011-10-08 | 3527 WYMAN CRESCENT K1V 0Y9 | OTTAWA ON | Canada |
7150628 CANADA INC. | 2009-07-31 to 2014-07-02 | Care of: KANG LI TENG, 3527 WYMAN CR K1V 0Y9 | GLOUCESTER ON | Canada |
Nationwide Sports Liquidator Inc. | 2010-10-14 to 2013-08-10 | Care of: Kang Li Teng, 3527 Wyman Cr K1V 0Y9 | Gloucester ON | Canada |
8333343 Canada Inc. | 2012-10-24 to 2019-08-24 | Care of: Kang Li Teng, 3527 Wyman Cr K1V 0Y9 | Gloucester ON | Canada |
8664242 Canada Inc. | 2013-10-16 to 2016-10-01 | Care of: Shao Yimin, 31 Hawkesbury Rd L6E 1W2 | Markham ON | Canada |
Nationwide Event Liquidator Inc. | 2013-09-18 to 2016-07-23 | 3527 Wyman Cr K1V 0Y9 | Gloucester ON | Canada |
9081496 Canada Inc. | 2014-11-07 to 2017-09-16 | Care of: Kang Li Teng, 3527 Wyman Cr K1V 0Y9 | Gloucester ON | Canada |
9825380 Canada Inc. | 2016-07-11 | 199 Riversedge Cr K1V 0Z7 | Gloucester ON | Canada |
10430463 Canada Inc. | 2017-10-02 | Care of: Kang Li Teng, 199 Riversedge Cr K1V 0Z7 | Gloucester ON | Canada |
Nearby People
Name | Address | Town | Country |
---|---|---|---|
YANG LIU | 292 Trailgate Street | Ottawa ON K1V 0Z7 | Canada |
NING DING | 203 RIVERSIDE CRES | GLOUCESTER ON K1V 0Z7 | Canada |
JIANWEI TANG | 203 RIVERSIDE CRES | GLOUCESTER ON K1V 0Z7 | Canada |