DAVID L.E. CHARLES - OTTAWA ON - CANADA
DAVID L.E. CHARLES - OTTAWA ON - CANADA
559440
Person Overview
DAVID L.E. CHARLES is a company officer from OTTAWA ON in Canada.
According to our records this person is, or was, a Director of FLAME LILY HOLDING CORPORATION.
Address
26 BOWER STREET
OTTAWA ON
K1S 0K1
Canada
Map
Company Appointments
Name | Active From | Address | town | country |
---|---|---|---|---|
FLAME LILY HOLDING CORPORATION | 1985-03-15 to 1985-05-16 | 2660 SOUTHVALE CRES. K1B 4W5 | OTTAWA ON | Canada |
NAPRA SOLUTIONS INC. | 2001-04-26 to 2008-10-17 | 66 SLATER STREET, SUITE 1900 K2P 2K9 | OTTAWA ON | Canada |
Nearby People
Name | Address | Town | Country |
---|---|---|---|
A.G. GOLDSMITH | 8 BOWER STREET | OTTAWA ON K1S 0K1 | Canada |
DAVID L. E. CHARLES | 26 BOWER STREET | OTTAWA ON K1S 0K1 | Canada |
ALVARO POMBO | 22 BOWER AVENUE | OTTAWA ON K1S 0K1 | Canada |
John Goldsmith | 8 Bower Street | Ottawa ON K1S 0K1 | Canada |
IAN SADINSKY | 12 Bower Street | Ottawa ON K1S 0K1 | Canada |
DAN OAKES | 18 BOWER ST | OTTAWA ON K1S 0K1 | Canada |
DAVID CHARLES | 26 Bower Street | Ottawa ON K1S 0K1 | Canada |