MICHEL FORTIN - ILE-DES-SOEURS QC - CANADA
MICHEL FORTIN - ILE-DES-SOEURS QC - CANADA
41061
Person Overview
MICHEL FORTIN is a company officer from ILE-DES-SOEURS QC in Canada.
According to our records this person is, or was, a Director of COMMANDITE INNOVAM 108 INC..
Address
229 DE LANOUE
ILE-DES-SOEURS QC
H3E 9Z7
Canada
Map
Company Appointments
Name | Active From | Address | town | country |
---|---|---|---|---|
COMMANDITE INNOVAM 108 INC. | 1987-06-16 to 2002-05-02 | 3429 RUE DRUMMOND, BUREAU 300 H3G 1X6 | MONTREAL QC | Canada |
153398 CANADA INC. | 1986-12-17 to 1999-10-19 | 3429 RUE DRUMMOND, BUREAU 300 H3G 1X6 | MONTREAL QC | Canada |
Nearby People
Name | Address | Town | Country |
---|---|---|---|
LISE GAGNON | 509 DELANOUE | ILE DES SOEURS QC H3E 9Z7 | Canada |
ELAINE G. LOPEZ | 205 PLACE DU SOLEIL, APT.201 | ILE DES SOEURS QC H3E 9Z7 | Canada |
ANDRE LAFRANCE | 187 PLACE DU SOLEIL | ILE DES SOEURS QC H3E 9Z7 | Canada |
ANDRE ROY | 231 DE LANOUE | NUN'S ISLAND QC H3E 9Z7 | Canada |
A. MANGANELLI | 97 PLACE DU SOLEIL | ILE DES SOEURS, VERDUN QC H3E 9Z7 | Canada |
ANDREA MANGANELLI | 97 PLACE DU SOLEIL | ILE DES SOEURS QC H3E 9Z7 | Canada |
NICOLE BEAUDOIN | 109 PLACE DU SOLEIL | ILE DES SOEURS QC H3E 9Z7 | Canada |
GREGORY GALARDO | 146 PLACE DU SOLEIL | NUN'S ISLAND, VERDUN QC H3E 9Z7 | Canada |