ROBERT LEGROS - ILE GOHIER, CARIGNAN QC - CANADA
ROBERT LEGROS - ILE GOHIER, CARIGNAN QC - CANADA
352477
Person Overview
ROBERT LEGROS is a company officer from ILE GOHIER, CARIGNAN QC in Canada.
According to our records this person is, or was, a Director of ALIMENTATION SORGEL INC..
Address
2057 BOUL. DES ROSES
ILE GOHIER, CARIGNAN QC
J4L 5E1
Canada
Map
Company Appointments
Name | Active From | Address | town | country |
---|---|---|---|---|
ALIMENTATION SORGEL INC. | 1980-02-22 to 1991-12-10 | 5103 RUE LANDRY J3Y 8E6 | ST-HUBERT QC | Canada |
GESTION TOUGAS & LEGROS INC. | 1981-03-18 to 1990-02-19 | 5080 RUE DUDEMAINE H4T 1N6 | MONTREAL QC | Canada |
ALIMENTATION DUDEMAINE INC. | 1982-04-19 | 2231 RUE BOURBONNIERE H1W 3P2 | MONTREAL QC | Canada |
GESTION LEGROS, FRENETTE, LEGROS INC. | 1983-10-27 to 1992-01-13 | 3640 MONTEE ST-HUBERT J3Y 4J7 | ST-HUBERT QC | Canada |
GESTION ROBERT LEGROS INC. | 1986-05-23 | 2231 BOURBONNIERE H1W 1P2 | MONTREAL QC | Canada |