F.A. CHEFTECHI - AHUNTSIC QC - CANADA
F.A. CHEFTECHI - AHUNTSIC QC - CANADA
305308
Person Overview
F.A. CHEFTECHI is a company officer from AHUNTSIC QC in Canada.
According to our records this person is, or was, a Director of 95334 CANADA LTD..
Address
2366 ETIENNE-PARENT STREET
AHUNTSIC QC
H3M 1P1
Canada
Map
Company Appointments
Name | Active From | Address | town | country |
---|---|---|---|---|
95334 CANADA LTD. | 1979-11-29 to 1984-08-10 | 1 PLACE VILLE MARIE, SUITE 930 H3B 2A5 | MONTREAL QC | Canada |
97398 CANADA LIMITEE | 1980-03-11 to 1986-08-05 | 10 RUE ST-JACQUES, BUREAU 809 BUREAU 1003 H2Y 1L3 | MONTREAL QC | Canada |
NORAH RUBIN FAMILY INVESTMENTS LTD. | 1980-04-24 to 1983-01-13 | 59 CURLEW DRIVE M3A 2P8 | DON MILLS ON | Canada |
ARROW AUDIO INC. | 1980-04-25 to 1983-08-18 | 2134 TRANS CANADA HW. SOUTH H9P 2N4 | DORVAL QC | Canada |
SYBERO LTD. | 1583 HOLLIS STREET B3J 2X2 | HALIFAX NS | Canada | |
99336 CANADA INC. | 1980-07-09 to 1988-11-03 | Care of: BURNET & ASS., 425 1ST ST. ESSO PLAZA T2P 3L8 | CALGARY AB | Canada |
ANNUAIRE DES VETERINAIRES DU CANADA INC. | 1981-04-23 to 1993-10-04 | 4930 COTE DES NEIGES H3V 1H2 | MONTREAL QC | Canada |
107891 CANADA INC. | 1981-06-10 to 1987-08-31 | 5126 AVENUE DU PARC, SUITE 102 H2V 4G5 | MONTREAL QC | Canada |
I C INPUT CANADA INC. | 1981-08-31 | 2775 SHERBROOKE EST, 2E ETAGE, SUITE 4 H2K 1B9 | MONTREAL QC | Canada |