IRWIN FREMETH - DOLLARD DES ORMEAUX QC - CANADA
IRWIN FREMETH - DOLLARD DES ORMEAUX QC - CANADA
178302
Person Overview
IRWIN FREMETH is a company officer from DOLLARD DES ORMEAUX QC in Canada.
According to our records this person is, or was, a Director of THE SOUTH L'ACHIGAN FARMS INC..
Address
9 TRENTON
DOLLARD DES ORMEAUX QC
H9B 1B6
Canada
Map
Company Appointments
Name | Active From | Address | town | country |
---|---|---|---|---|
THE SOUTH L'ACHIGAN FARMS INC. | 1993-03-18 | 459 boul ste sophie, SAINTE SOPHIE J5J 2V1 | QUEBEC QC | Canada |
Laurentian Ostrich Farm Inc. | 1994-03-03 to 2012-12-31 | 459, boul. Ste-Sophie J5J 2V1 | Sainte Sophie QC | Canada |
DANLI FARM INC. | 1995-11-23 to 2008-03-13 | 459 Boul Ste-Sophie J5J 2V1 | SAINTE SOPHIE QC | Canada |
Nearby People
Name | Address | Town | Country |
---|---|---|---|
IRWIN FREMETH | 9 Rue Trenton | Dollard-des-Ormeaux QC H9B 1B6 | Canada |
ALLEN KATZ | 23 TRENTON | DOLLARD-DES-ORMEAUX QC H9B 1B6 | Canada |