ALAIN LUCAS - STE-THERESE QC - CANADA
ALAIN LUCAS - STE-THERESE QC - CANADA
171027
Person Overview
ALAIN LUCAS is a company officer from STE-THERESE QC in Canada.
According to our records this person is, or was, a Director of CENTRE DE TRANSIT LARCAS INC..
Address
836 BOUL. DES MILLE ILES
STE-THERESE QC
Canada
Map
Company Appointments
Name | Active From | Address | town | country |
---|---|---|---|---|
CENTRE DE TRANSIT LARCAS INC. | 1979-11-27 to 1996-06-07 | 4720 GARAND H4R 2A2 | ST-LAURENT QC | Canada |
TRANSPORT S.P.M. (QC) LTEE | 1989-03-30 to 1996-06-21 | 4720 RUE GARAND H4R 2A2 | ST-LAURENT QC | Canada |
Transport St-Pierre et Miquelon (Halifax) Ltée | 1988-12-20 to 2006-02-09 | 4720 RUE GARAND H4R 2A2 | ST-LAURENT QC | Canada |