QINGWEN HUANG - UNIONVILLE ON - CANADA
QINGWEN HUANG - UNIONVILLE ON - CANADA
1320904
Person Overview
Qingwen Huang is a company officer from Unionville ON in Canada.
According to our records this person is, or was, a Director of Canada-China Technology Education & Culture Development Ltd..
Address
23 Hagerman Blvd
Unionville ON
L3R 2A8
Canada
Map
Company Appointments
Name | Active From | Address | town | country |
---|---|---|---|---|
Canada-China Technology Education & Culture Development Ltd. | 2016-05-24 to 2022-02-15 | Care of: Yongbiao Ding, 200 Consumers Road M2J 4R4 | Toronto ON | Canada |
Skystars Capital Inc. | 2016-06-21 to 2019-04-26 | Care of: Hai Xing Chen, 700 Bay Street, Suite 1100 M5G 1Z6 | Toronto ON | Canada |
ACGT Capital Inc. | 2016-06-30 to 2019-04-29 | Care of: Hai Xing Chen, 700 Bay Street M5G 1Z6 | Toronto ON | Canada |
Mega Maple Construction Inc. | 2018-02-26 to 2020-08-28 | 105 Gordon Baker, Unit 402 M2H 3R1 | Toronto ON | Canada |
Nearby People
Name | Address | Town | Country |
---|---|---|---|
BRIAN J. ANDERSON | 17 HAGERMAN BOUL. | UNIONVILLE ON L3R 2A8 | Canada |
A.P. TRACEY | 11 HAGERMAN BLVD. | UNIONVILLE ON L3R 2A8 | Canada |
ERIC WYATT TURSMAN | 15 HAGERMAN BLVD. | UNIONVILLE ON L3R 2A8 | Canada |
JEFFREY K. YAMAMOTO | 25 HAGERMAN BLVD. | MARKHAM ON L3R 2A8 | Canada |
RUI TAN | 17 Hagerman Boulevard | Markham ON L3R 2A8 | Canada |
BING BING FU | 5 Hagerman Blvd | Unionville ON L3R 2A8 | Canada |