ROBERT ANTONIADES - TORONTO ON - CANADA
ROBERT ANTONIADES - TORONTO ON - CANADA
1050690
Person Overview
ROBERT ANTONIADES is a company officer from Toronto ON in Canada.
According to our records this person is, or was, a Director of Infobright Inc..
Address
116 Dinnick Crescent
Toronto ON
M4N 1L8
Canada
Map
Company Appointments
Name | Active From | Address | town | country |
---|---|---|---|---|
Infobright Inc. | 2005-06-13 to 2019-07-31 | 365 Bay Street, Suite 800 M5H 2V1 | Toronto ON | Canada |
The Upside Foundation of Canada | 2012-12-21 | Care of: Alexis Fitzjohn/Mahsa Pezeshki, 333 Bay Street, Suite 2400 M5H 2T6 | Toronto ON | Canada |
Information Venture Partners Inc. | 2014-09-15 | 1 University Avenue, Suite 1901 M5J 2P1 | Toronto ON | Canada |
9528601 CANADA INC. | 2015-11-27 | 233 Grenview Blvd S M8Y 3V2 | Toronto ON | Canada |
Information Venture Partners Management Inc. | 2015-11-27 | 49 Wellington Street East, Suite 301 M5E 1C9 | Toronto ON | Canada |
Information Venture Partners III GP Inc. | 2019-08-20 | 49 Wellington Street East, Suite 301 M5E 1C9 | Toronto ON | Canada |
IVP SPV GP Inc. | 2019-08-28 to 2021-11-18 | 1 University Avenue, Suite 1901 M5J 2P1 | Toronto ON | Canada |
Information Venture Partners IV GP Inc. | 2022-09-16 | 49 Wellington Street East, Suite 301 M5E 1C9 | Toronto ON | Canada |
MADESARU INC. | 16 WINSTON GROVE M8Y 2K8 | ETOBICOKE ON | Canada |
Nearby People
Name | Address | Town | Country |
---|---|---|---|
DONALD R. AITKEN | 134 DINNICK CRESCENT | TORONTO ON M4N 1L8 | Canada |
JOHN S. BUCHAN | 92 DINNICK CRES. | TORONTO ON M4N 1L8 | Canada |
ROBERT SANKEY | 136 Dinnick Crescent | Toronto ON M4N 1L8 | Canada |
M.F. ROBERTS | 90 DINNICK CRES. | TORONTO ON M4N 1L8 | Canada |
G. LAMOUREUX | 116 DENNICK CRESCENT | TORONTO ON M4N 1L8 | Canada |
WILLIAM D. GOLDSTEIN | 130 DINNICK CRES | TORONTO ON M4N 1L8 | Canada |
TIMOTHY STANLEY | 140 DINNICK CRESCENT | TORONTO ON M4N 1L8 | Canada |
CHARLOTTE STANLEY | 140 DINNICK CRESCENT | TORONTO ON M4N 1L8 | Canada |