SAMUEL A. THOMPSON - LAVAL QC - CANADA
SAMUEL A. THOMPSON - LAVAL QC - CANADA
104342
Person Overview
SAMUEL A. THOMPSON is a company officer from LAVAL QC in Canada.
According to our records this person is, or was, a Director of S.G. UNIVERSAL ENERGY SYSTEMS CORPORATION.
Address
306 DES PRES
LAVAL QC
H7N 1C5
Canada
Map
Company Appointments
Name | Active From | Address | town | country |
---|---|---|---|---|
S.G. UNIVERSAL ENERGY SYSTEMS CORPORATION | 1993-05-05 to 2000-03-06 | 306 DES PRES ST H7N 1C5 | LAVAL QC | Canada |
158739 CANADA INC. | 1987-11-20 to 2011-12-11 | Care of: S. Archie Thompson, 306 Des Pres H7N 1C5 | Laval QC | Canada |
Nearby People
Name | Address | Town | Country |
---|---|---|---|
S. ARCHIE THOMPSON | 306 DES PRES | LAVAL DES RAPIDES QC H7N 1C5 | Canada |
REAL FOURNIER | 300 DES PRES | LAVAL QC H7N 1C5 | Canada |
S.A. THOMPSON | 306 DES PRES | LAV DES RAPIDES QC H7N 1C5 | Canada |
GILLES MENARD | 358 DES PRES | LAVAL DES RAPIDES, LAVAL QC H7N 1C5 | Canada |
MICHEL JULIEN | 308A DES PRES | LAVAL DES RAPIDES QC H7N 1C5 | Canada |
MARK THOMPSON | 306 DES PRES | LAVAL QC H7N 1C5 | Canada |
SAMUEL ARCHIE THOMPSON | 306 DES PRES STREET | LAVAL QC H7N 1C5 | Canada |
JOHN GIANNOPOULOS | 322 Rue Des Prés | Laval-des-Rapides QC H7N 1C5 | Canada |