CANADA-PAKISTAN BUSINESS COUNCIL - RICHMOND HILL ON CANADA
Company Information
CANADA-PAKISTAN BUSINESS COUNCIL is a company from RICHMOND HILL ON Canada.
The company has corporate status: Active.
CANADA-PAKISTAN BUSINESS COUNCIL - RICHMOND HILL ON CANADA
731705
CANADA-PAKISTAN BUSINESS COUNCIL is governed under the Canada Not-for-profit Corporations Act - 2014-10-09. It a company of type: Non-Soliciting.
The date of the company's last Annual Meeting is 2023-11-10.
The status of its annual filings are: 2024 - Not due, 2023 -Filed, 2022 -Filed.
This company has had the following names:
- CANADA-PAKISTAN BUSINESS COUNCIL - 2014-10-09 to Present
- CANADA-PAKISTAN BUSINESS COUNCIL - 1987-05-11to 2014-10-09
- CANADA-PAKISTAN CONSEIL ECONOMIQUE ET COMMERCIAL - 1983-01-28to 1987-05-11
CANADA-PAKISTAN BUSINESS COUNCIL has between 3 and 15 directors.
Address & Map
16 LISA CRESCENT
RICHMOND HILL ON L4B 3J4,
Canada
Company Officers
Name | Address | Town | Country |
---|---|---|---|
ELLIOT TEPPER | 36 IVERNESS AVENUE | OTTAWA ON K2E 6N7 | Canada |
FARAH SHAMS | 6002 LEESIDE CRES | MISSISSAUGA ON L5Z 5L9 | Canada |
RAFI MUSTAFA | 203-7481 WOODBINE AVE | MARKHAM ON L3R 2W1 | Canada |
JAYNE PILOT | 25 GREAT LAKE DR | BRAMPTON ON L6R 0T8 | Canada |
BYRON WILFERT | 45 O’CONNOR ST, TACTIX WORLD EXCHANGE PLAZA #700 | OTTAWA ON K1P 1A4 | Canada |
ZAKIR ABDI | 225 DUNCAN MILL ROAD, SUITE 904 | TORONTO ON M3B 3H9 | Canada |
SAMIR DOSSAL | 16 Lisa Crescent | Richmond Hill ON L4B 3J4 | Canada |
NILUFER MAMA | 5 Pickard Lane | Brampton ON L6Y 2M4 | Canada |
Related Companies
Name | Address | Town | Country | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|
Kaloca Holdings Inc. | 16 Lisa Crescent | RichmondHill ON, L4B 3J4 | Canada | Dissolved for non-compliance (s. 212)on 2013-11-30 |
Canadian Friends of Zoroastrians | 199 Bay Street, 5300 Commerce Court West | Toronto ON, M5L 1B9 | Canada | Active |
Nearby Businesses
Name | Address | Town | Country | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|
Kaloca Holdings Inc. | 16 Lisa Crescent | RichmondHill ON, L4B 3J4 | Canada | Dissolved for non-compliance (s. 212)on 2013-11-30 |